Financial history NORTH PADDINGTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 303301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £202.52k £214.81k £212.14k £225.48k £201.00k
Total expenditure £179.09k £242.65k £154.41k £172.54k £209.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £65.02k £19.00k
Income from government grants £13.51k £5.00k £1.52k £65.02k £19.00k