NORTH PADDINGTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NPYC's facilities include a multi-purpose sports hall, gym, I.T. room, kitchen, lounge, music room, art room, sensory room & youth hall for activities such as pool, table tennis, and board games. Holiday programmes include flying lessons, go karting, quad biking, driving lessons, jet ski-ing, sky diving, horse riding, scuba diving, cable ski-ing, theatre trips & residential experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £19,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 16 September 1963: Standard registration
- NORTH PADDINGTON BOY'S CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AARON LINCOLN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alice Constance Sinclair | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER WATT | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
KARA ST ANGE - MESSE | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hamza Taouzzale | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leila Hedjem | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.52k | £214.81k | £212.14k | £225.48k | £201.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.09k | £242.65k | £154.41k | £172.54k | £209.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.02k | £19.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.51k | £5.00k | £1.52k | £65.02k | £19.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF BOYS RESIDENT IN PADDINGTON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS, AND IN PARTICULAR WITH A VIEW TO CARRYING OUT THE BEFORE MENTIONED OBJECTS TO ORGANISE, RUN AND MAINTAIN A CLUB FOR SUCH BOYS.
Area of benefit
PADDINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
229 Lanark Road
LONDON
W9 1EA
- Phone:
- 02038750412
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window