THE FEDERATION OF LONDON YOUTH CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to support and challenge young people to become the best they can be. Our vision is that all young Londoners grow up healthy, able to navigate a fulfilling career and make a positive contribution in their communities. We support them to develop the confidence, resilience and relationship skills they need through our network of community youth clubs and at our residential centres
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£7,173,465
Donations and legacies | £351.88k | |
Charitable activities | £6.52m | |
Other trading activities | £100.41k | |
Investments | £205.49k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,059,431
Raising funds | £449.50k | |
Charitable activities | £8.60m | |
Other | £10.01k |
£115,191 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,734,678 from 6 government contract(s) and £2,734,678 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £459.51k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.60m |
People

134 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- East Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 November 1962: Standard registration
- 22 July 1993: Removed
- LONDON YOUTH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Moss CBE | Chair | 02 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Linzi Thomas | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lily Tidy | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael James Bishop | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nimtaz-Tanya Noordin | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julie Annette Milnes | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Morenike Ajayi MBE | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Kevin Peter Holian | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHARLINE ZEPHORIA KING | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
STUART ANDREW THOMSON | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID MILLER | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
SIMON ANDREW TUREK | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38m | £6.58m | £5.34m | £7.01m | £7.17m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.96m | £6.01m | £6.63m | £8.10m | £9.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.43m | £2.73m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.18m | £465.42k | £1.57m | £1.43m | £2.73m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £362.50k | £263.29k | £697.55k | £708.06k | £351.88k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £157.67k | £82.37k | £43.39k | £73.78k | £100.41k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.66m | £4.25m | £4.14m | £6.04m | £6.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £203.36k | £213.97k | £168.05k | £184.37k | £205.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £500 | £1.77m | £289.22k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.04k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.61m | £5.77m | £6.38m | £7.61m | £8.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £269.87k | £198.99k | £238.48k | £486.91k | £449.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £120.33k | £118.81k | £96.52k | £110.31k | £235.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £826.95k | £561.50k | £1.57m | £1.06m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £27.55k | £28.47k | £8.07k | £9.27k | £6.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £79.55k | £34.98k | £9.21k | £6.48k | £10.01k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.33m | £6.90m | £6.60m | £7.32m | £7.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.25m | £6.41m | £8.39m | £7.58m | £7.11m | |
|
Other assets | £4.17m | £4.97m | £2.78m | £1.05m | £1.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.42m | £1.22m | £941.26k | £947.06k | £2.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/08/1931 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/02/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2018
Charitable objects
(1) PROMOTING THE PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE: AND (2) PREVENTING AND/OR RELIEVING POVERTY BY ASSISTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Linked charities
- 20 November 1962 : Standard registration
- 22 July 1993 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON YOUTH
47-49 PITFIELD STREET
LONDON
N1 6DA
- Phone:
- 07384216258
- Email:
- gary.murphy@londonyouth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window