3RD NENE (PETERBOROUGH) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training through games and activities for young people from the age of 6 years to 14 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 02 April 1971: Standard registration
- 45TH PETERBOROUGH (SOUTHFIELDS) GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD WEST | Chair | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alex Burgess | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE D'ANGELO | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LANGWADE | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLEN VINCENT | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN ANN LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.71k | £40.81k | £7.71k | £8.60k | £13.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.73k | £4.14k | £24.54k | £24.22k | £13.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £612 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 283 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949 18 FEBRUARY 1959 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
SCOUT GROUP (UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
STANGROUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 NORTH STREET
STANGROUND
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 8HR
- Phone:
- 07387669644
- Email:
- GSL@3RDSTANGROUNDSCOUTS.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window