Governing document WILTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 18 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WILTSHIRE AND THE DISTRICT OF SWINDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
NORTH WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.