Financial history KINGSBRIDGE DARTMOUTH AND TOTNES YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE

Charity Number: 1068553
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £85.00k £75.06k £79.33k £99.60k £91.39k
Total expenditure £77.60k £72.04k £85.58k £91.28k £107.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A