PUBLOW AND PENSFORD MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of village hall and its facilities, these are provided to the local community and surrounding area for hire for private and public functions. Maintenance of changing facilities for various sporting organisations using sports field. Fundraising for hall and village organisations. Maintenance of childrens play area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 14 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Wilcox | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Ann Gully | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charles Roger Stephenson | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Burbridge | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.91k | £1.29k | £21.54k | £8.75k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.63k | £7.43k | £17.31k | £9.62k | £7.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 April 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 6 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PUBLOW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF ( HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR THE MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Publow & Pensford Memorial Playing
Field and Village Hall
Publow Lane
Pensford
Bristol
BS39 4HW
- Phone:
- 07900407695
- Email:
- PENSFORDHALL@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window