Trustees 1ST DEAL (WALMER) GROUP OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 303374

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Hayes Culpin | Chair | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Rose South | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Goodwin | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amber Blackwell | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ronald Jordan | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN RACKHAM | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Rackham | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE RACKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.