2ND DEAL (WALMER) SEA SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sea Scouting and Training for water activities from 6 years to 25 years. We also have Leaders and committee members of all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 2ND DEAL AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Goodwin | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Noddings | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ella Tappenden | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marchbanks | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Collard | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Martin | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Curling | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Goodwin | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANE FERRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN DALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.41k | £25.19k | £12.55k | £12.00k | £26.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.28k | £18.24k | £32.07k | £15.60k | £15.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.04k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 24TH JULY 1959 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
2ND DEAL AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
DEAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 SYDNEY ROAD
WALMER
DEAL
CT14 9JW
- Phone:
- 01304364721
- Email:
- cgoo2nd@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
2nddealseascouts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window