Accounts and annual returns PEARLS ( PROVIDING EDUCATION ACCOMMODATION AND REAL LIFE SKILLS)

Charity number: 1072714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 15 April 2024 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 26 April 2022 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required