11TH GILLINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting is the largest co-educational youth organisation in the World with over 28 million members world-wide. Scouting exists to contribute to the development of young people by helping them grow up to be self-reliant, responsible and caring citizens.It is open to those of all faiths and offers equal opportunities to all young people aged between 6 and 25 years old in the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,836
Total expenditure: £25,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Gibbs Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Katie Irvine Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Daryl Ian Tudball Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES GALE Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
MICHAEL BARRY WATSON Trustee 13 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.63k £14.57k £9.60k £17.97k £18.84k
Total expenditure £12.86k £12.59k £10.26k £14.39k £25.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 York Avenue
CHATHAM
Kent
ME5 9ER
Phone:
01634 684355
Website:

No information available