Financial history THE UKRAINE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 1061221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.87k £83.23k £264.56k £254.09k £103.11k
Total expenditure £69.44k £64.85k £115.99k £241.28k £190.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A