THE UKRAINE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote the advancement of the Christian religion or the material assistance of the poor or the advacnement of education in The Ukraine (and other countries of the world as opportunities arise), by conducting seminars with local pastors and assisting them with church planting and mission work, and the provison of relief supplies to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
- Ukraine
Governance
- 13 March 1997: Standard registration
- UKRAINE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Michael Roper | Chair | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lythell | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Gareth MorGan | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Wilson | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Ward | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.87k | £83.23k | £264.56k | £254.09k | £103.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.44k | £64.85k | £115.99k | £241.28k | £190.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE SOCIETIES OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS WILL PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE MATERIAL ASSISTANCE OF THE POOR OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
UKRAINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 Albert Road
POOLE
Dorset
BH12 2BX
- Phone:
- 07915176759
- Email:
- info@ucm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window