1ST WINDMILL HILL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly meetings of Beavers, Cubs and Scout. Regular camps and outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 11 December 1970: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH, GRAVESEND SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jackson | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Painting | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Loft | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillippa Jackson | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Perrott | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sohni Perrott | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Austin | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Huckle | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Livett | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD PAINTING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £18.40k | £15.34k | £1.40k | £15.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £3.61k | £16.19k | £7.01k | £18.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.00k | £1.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 January 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
GRAVESEND
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 WINCHESTER CRESCENT
GRAVESEND
DA12 5RY
- Phone:
- 01474324776
- Email:
- 1stwindmillgsl@gmail.com
- Website:
-
1stwindmillhillscouts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window