Financial history GRAVESHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £107.36k £79.72k £85.52k £196.96k £122.49k
Total expenditure £131.36k £44.66k £86.79k £204.64k £159.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £60.48k £16.00k N/A N/A