GRAVESHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote Scouting to the young people of Gravesham in Kent, including operating the District Campsite.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- GRAVESEND BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- GRAVESHAM SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Jones | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Austin | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Wallis | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Leanne Beattie | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Reeves | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PAINTING | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Myles Sullivan | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Livett | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Duncumb | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Patrick | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|||||
ALAN SKELTON | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD RUDDICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.36k | £79.72k | £85.52k | £196.96k | £122.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.36k | £44.66k | £86.79k | £204.64k | £159.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.48k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopehill
Wrotham Road
South Street
Meopham
Gravesend
DA13 0QJ
- Phone:
- 07834430718
- Email:
- media@graveshamscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window