Financial history CASHES GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1078341
Charity reporting is up to date (163 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £26.97k £20.36k £22.88k £54.19k £70.21k
Total expenditure £18.80k £20.57k £21.91k £42.49k £66.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £10.25k £17.49k £19.84k £53.33k