Financial history 1ST HERNE BAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.90k £21.93k £10.65k £8.77k £10.71k
Total expenditure £19.04k £4.72k £10.91k £17.25k £10.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k £2.67k N/A N/A