1ST HERNE BAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout group with Scout, Cub and Beaver sections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 18 March 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST HERNE BAY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Syrett | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Green | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Prevett | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Locke | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Syrett | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Lavender | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kellyann Eskisan | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Harrap-Stanley | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodges | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Locke | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Canavan | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Brooks | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Ericson | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.90k | £21.93k | £10.65k | £8.77k | £10.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.04k | £4.72k | £10.91k | £17.25k | £10.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
1ST HERNE BAY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HERNE BAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Herne Bay Scout Group
65-67 Arkley Road
HERNE BAY
Kent
CT6 5SL
- Phone:
- 01
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window