LOOSE SWISS SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 303413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £27,599
Total expenditure: £22,795

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Flack Chair 05 March 2025
None on record
Jessica Mancktelow Trustee 05 March 2025
None on record
PAUL MICHAEL WORDEN Trustee 20 September 2012
None on record
ANNA BOWMAN Trustee 27 August 2011
None on record
Stephen Colin George Harley Trustee 01 May 2007
None on record
AUDREY BEECHING Trustee
None on record
MARK KEABLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.69k £40.13k £41.30k £26.23k £27.60k
Total expenditure £24.99k £28.63k £29.80k £22.11k £22.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £23.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
44 Pickering Street
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 9RR
Phone:
07804604416