THE THANET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide general activites for young people under the umbrella of the Scout Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 25 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Thomas McCollum | Chair | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Jane Goldfinch | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Daniel Morris | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Phillpott | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darci Lee Arthur | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sarah Curry | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Dumbarton | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Horne | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hodges | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Graham-Horne | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.01k | £76.50k | £54.58k | £90.17k | £89.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.59k | £62.86k | £17.42k | £90.24k | £83.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF THANET
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Spurling Cannon Ltd
424 Margate Road
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT12 6SJ
- Phone:
- 01843 848383
- Website:
-
thanetscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window