1ST NORTHFLEET (20TH GRAVESEND) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUTING ACTIVITIES PROVIDED FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. SECTIONS EXIST FOR BEAVERS, CUB SCOUTS AND SCOUTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 20 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Shane Mochrie-Cox | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Wilson | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Pringle | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CONYERS | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Cronin | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Norris | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Braine | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Norris | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Annable | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.98k | £37.14k | £21.63k | £18.35k | £18.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £28.01k | £12.85k | £25.04k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.19k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH JANUARY 1967
Charitable objects
1ST NORTHFLEET (20TH GRAVESEND) SCOUT GROUP (A UNIT OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NORTHFLEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Charles Drive
Cuxton
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 1DT
- Phone:
- 07584317291
- Website:
-
1stnorthfleetscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window