Trustees 1ST NORTHFLEET (20TH GRAVESEND) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Shane Mochrie-Cox | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Wilson | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Pringle | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CONYERS | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Cronin | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Norris | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Braine | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Norris | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Annable | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.