Governing document WINCHESTER HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1061855

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 NOV 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2018 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEB 2020 as amended on 08 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are the provision of low cost housing for sale, shared ownership or disposal by any other means or for rent or occupation by licence or otherwise within the South of England
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.