30TH STROOD (CUXTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A branch of The Scout Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,891
Total expenditure: £23,157

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 30TH MEDWAY WEST (CUXTON) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Copeland Trustee 08 July 2023
None on record
Ann Hayes Trustee 23 November 2020
FRIENDS OF DOWNE ACTIVITY CENTRE
Received: On time
ASH REYNOLDS Trustee 08 November 2019
None on record
Stephen Michael Dartnell Trustee 17 September 2018
None on record
MATTHEW STUART DARTNELL Trustee 24 September 2013
None on record
JIM BALDOCK Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
SIMON WHITE Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record
MATTHEW WELLS Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
DONNA MAK Trustee 22 January 2012
None on record
PAULA JANE A'BEAR Trustee
None on record
CARRIE LYNNE PAYNE Trustee
None on record
DAVID MICHAEL PAYNE Trustee
None on record
NIGEL ROBERT AUTHUR BUSSEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.29k £11.54k £15.04k £16.63k £18.89k
Total expenditure £19.54k £5.27k £16.42k £24.51k £23.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £10.00k N/A N/A £450

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 May 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 March 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scout Hall
Cuxton
Rochester
ME2 1LJ
Phone:
07809 201 838
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available