Financial history 3RD SEVENOAKS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.34k £27.82k £42.60k £29.82k £42.58k
Total expenditure £17.43k £21.27k £28.18k £34.76k £57.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.05k £9.89k £1.04k £350