Trustees CROSS MEMORIAL HALL
Charity Number: 1071933

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lester Parry | Chair | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Ian Mason | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Shaw | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rolfe | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephen Ardiff | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Ann Ardiff | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Windmill | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hatton | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.