FRIENDS OF OLD SODBURY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £5,290
Total expenditure: £3,697

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOSSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Hunter Chair 26 January 2023
None on record
Hazel Lumley Heyworth Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
James Bell Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Manisha de Silva-blagg Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Emma Louise Doney Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Jennifer Dickson Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
BERNICE WEBBER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.49k £5.55k £5.12k £7.73k £5.29k
Total expenditure £7.47k £7.62k £1.70k £8.65k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 July 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 July 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 March 2021 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OLD SODBURY C E PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH LANE
OLD SODBURY
BRISTOL
BS37 6NB
Phone:
01454313682