Trustees 8TH TONBRIDGE (HILDENBOROUGH) SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 303464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce William Keenan | Chair | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josh Barkaway | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wingfield | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick Cope | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Bird | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin George Cope | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Keenan | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH COPE | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.