KENT COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,987,472
Donations and legacies | £16.49k | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other trading activities | £275.44k | |
Investments | £26.98k | |
Other | £491.74k |
Total expenditure:
£1,606,369
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.61m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £24,525 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.61m | |
Retained for future use | £381.10k |
People

17 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
5231 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 23 May 1963: Standard registration
- KENT SCOUTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Desmond Peter Harris | Chair | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Amy Childs | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Jamie Paul Lucas | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Everest | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Grant | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Catherine Jane Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nirav Bipin Patel | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Matthew Bates | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
KENNETH RIDGWAY | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roy Hogben JP | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
NEIL GEARING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.26m | £438.82k | £720.40k | £1.54m | £1.99m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24m | £407.27k | £624.66k | £1.61m | £1.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.29k | £20.38k | £80.00k | £24.53k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £16.00k | N/A | £51.54k | £44.31k | £16.49k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £58.28k | N/A | £0 | £249.27k | £275.44k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.18m | N/A | £627.66k | £1.24m | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £762 | N/A | £95 | £3.78k | £26.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £100 | N/A | £41.11k | £0 | £491.74k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £10.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.24m | N/A | £621.76k | £1.61m | £1.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.39k | N/A | £2.90k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.24k | N/A | £0 | £17.20k | £34.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £8.90k | £1.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.67m | N/A | £1.59m | £1.60m | £1.56m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.36m | N/A | £2.21m | £2.02m | £2.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.06m | N/A | £1.71m | £1.59m | £1.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1936
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE KENT COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kent Scouts Activity Centre
Lower Grange Farm
Grange Lane
Sandling
Maidstone
ME14 3DA
- Phone:
- 01622397070
- Email:
- info@kentscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window