1ST THEYDON BOIS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout group providing social activites for boys and girls from the ages of 7 to 14
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 03 November 1965: Standard registration
- 1ST THEYDON BOIS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Patricia Koczan | Chair | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Jade Grimshaw | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Frankel | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Girling | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany May Sophia Bowles | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bowles | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Brian Keith Pascoe | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELLISON | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN PENMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.58k | £4.92k | £9.46k | £34.35k | £45.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.54k | £11.98k | £16.96k | £33.63k | £37.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
1ST THEYDON BOIS SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
THEYDON BOIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Theydon Park Road
Theydon Bois
EPPING
Essex
CM16 7LP
- Phone:
- 01992813709
- Email:
- bob.penman@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window