FINCHLEY, FRIERN BARNET AND GOLDERS GREEN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity Number: 303485
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Total income: £64,449
Total expenditure: £69,153
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Barnet
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 September 2009: Funds transferred to 1125880 BARNET BOROUGH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Organisation type:
Other names:
- FINCHLEY AND FRIERN BARNET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.75k | £44.58k | £54.43k | £64.45k | £64.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.39k | £36.23k | £76.31k | £69.15k | £69.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 03 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 03 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 25 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 07 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 5TH MAY, 1969 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
FINCHLEY AND FRIERN BARNET
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window