Financial history THE NEW GROUP OF WORLD SERVERS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1069944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £364.94k £431.27k £447.24k £390.44k £315.04k
Total expenditure £365.88k £431.56k £448.89k £390.73k £311.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.42k £11.90k £15.22k N/A N/A