Financial history 1ST BALDWYNS PARK SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP

Charity number: 303501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.42k £1.91k £7.21k £7.37k £6.35k
Total expenditure £18.08k £3.35k £4.67k £9.97k £6.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A