Financial history HOLME LACY VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 1068268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £4.77k £15.35k £24.32k £36.87k £48.50k
Total expenditure £6.21k £3.75k £15.49k £22.54k £71.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.83k £2.67k £29.87k