8TH BEXLEYHEATH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Scout group which includes Beavers, Cubs and Scouts, both boys and girls. Activities include Camping, games, learning new skills and teamwork
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
Governance
- 17 July 1969: Standard registration
- 8TH BEXLEY HEATH SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 8TH BEXLEY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Tonks | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Greville Hugh Billyard | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Denise Wootton | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ayca Emel Ilcen | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRANCE | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne France | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE FOSKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2019 | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.38k | £15.38k | £26.52k | £14.91k | £14.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.78k | £12.78k | £10.72k | £5.98k | £5.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 25TH APRIL 1969 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
BEXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Westbrooke Road
Welling
Kent
DA16 1PR
- Phone:
- 01322557998
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window