BEXLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Scouting for young people within the London Borough of Bexley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 25 March 1963: Standard registration
- BEXLEYHEATH AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- BEXLEY-HEATH DISTRICT SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- THE BEXLEY HEATH AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Joseph Cashin | Chair | 28 September 2017 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE CAROL HALL | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Stuart Neil Sutherland | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Burton | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Callum Mark Rest | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Goodson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hori Tribe | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher George Russell | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARGARET SPROWLES | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lee John Curtis | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.66k | £144.12k | £81.61k | £171.01k | £281.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.79k | £96.94k | £70.66k | £178.47k | £330.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £73.16k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 16TH MAY 1960, UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955. AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2017 as amended on 07 Apr 2022 as amended on 07 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BEXLEY HEATH AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
BEXLEY HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELVEDERE COMMUNITY CENTRE
MITCHELL CLOSE
BELVEDERE
DA17 6AA
- Phone:
- 07931 201613
- Website:
-
bexleyscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window