13TH ERITH (CHRIST CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUTING: activities for Beavers, Cubs and Scouts, to help develop healthy, happy, independent and responsible young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
Governance
- 16 November 1966: Standard registration
- 13TH ERITH BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Evans | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Kennor-Evans | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Kennor | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tubtim Packer | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Allen | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terry Hodges | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Davies | Trustee | 10 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOWETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVE IVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE DOUGLASS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH JOWETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £10.12k | £1.63k | £5.56k | £3.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £4.05k | £8.03k | £6.35k | £3.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 August 2024 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1966 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
13TH ERITH (CHRIST CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
ERITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
149 Avenue Road
ERITH
Kent
DA8 3BH
- Phone:
- 07947817212
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window