1ST FOOTS CRAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUTING ACTIVELY ENGAGES AND SUPPORTS YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, EMPOWERING THEM TO MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 31 March 1967: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 September 2010: Standard registration
- 1ST FOOTSCRAY SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 1ST FOOTSCRAY, SIDCUP, BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy Hopkins | Chair | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Avery Morris | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Louise Preston | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gina Dilling | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Dickinson | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Day | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wright | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Potts | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carly Dickinson | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karl-Heinz Paschael-Cantwell | Trustee | 17 November 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.59k | £32.61k | £35.12k | £37.52k | £34.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.23k | £11.21k | £24.50k | £22.86k | £26.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 04/01/1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28/03/1949, 18/02/1959, 5 /05/1967 AND 19/07/1991
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTLALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS A MEMBER OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
SIDCUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Foots Cray Scout Group
Rectory Lane
SIDCUP
DA14 5BP
- Phone:
- 020 3778 1770
- Email:
- gsl@footscrayscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window