THE NEW FOREST PONY BREEDING AND CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold and update the New Forest Pony Stud Book, promote pedigree and part bred New Forest Ponies here and around the world. Hold an Annual Breed Show and Stallion Show for New Forest ponies, Educate the public about New Forest ponies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNE KEMPE | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey-Ann Hayter | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Lang | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcom Ian Fry | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gover Fromm | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Luke Blomfield | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI JANE WHETREN | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS J A LOWTH | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HILARY PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN DAVID CHARLES INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER PIDGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA STEPHENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL COLIN DOVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
AMANDA PIDGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES HERBERT YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRUDY NINEHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY MARGARET TILLYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET FRANCIS WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.96k | £59.08k | £63.13k | £75.53k | £88.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.77k | £63.85k | £66.92k | £84.00k | £90.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.15k | £1.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN THE BEST STANDARD OF NEW FOREST PONIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deep Slade House
Ringwood Road
Bransgore
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 8AA
- Phone:
- 01425672775
- Email:
- info@newforestpony.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window