THE WOODLEY PILOT LIGHT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Food Store for those in need in the community; provision of RE lessons in local schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 July 1997: Standard registration
- RAINBOWS GRIEF SUPPORT (Working name)
- WOODLEY FOOD STORE (Working name)
- WOODLEY LIGHTHOUSE (Working name)
- WOODLEY LIGHTHOUSE DEBT ADVICE (Working name)
- THE PILOT LIGHT TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Cook | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hope | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Van Es | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.53k | £35.63k | £38.57k | £53.17k | £53.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.00k | £25.22k | £18.66k | £22.36k | £29.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
16 May 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, PARTICULARLY THROUGH COUNSELLING AND OUTREACH
Area of benefit
WOODLEY, WOKINGHAM AND READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodley Baptist Church
Hurricane Way
Woodley
READING
Berkshire
RG5 4UX
- Phone:
- 01189699956
- Email:
- counselling@pilotlight.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window