MISYS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity, as set out in the Declaration of Trust, is to support the advancement of education in the principles and provision of communications and information technology and their application in industry and commerce.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 1997: Standard registration
- 30 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MCF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.20k | £153.83k | £162.73k | £57.69k | £19.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.34k | £204.60k | £86.50k | £160.08k | £143.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PROVISION OF COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND THEIR APPLICATION IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window