LEIGH HOUSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1063739
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintaining and developing Leigh House as a base for various voluntary sector groups working in Radstock and the wider north east Somerset area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £16,095
Total expenditure: £22,262

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELAINE MCLAREN Chair
None on record
ANAMARIJA JOVCIC-SAS Trustee
None on record
MERYN MCLAREN Trustee
None on record
WAYNE TEALL Trustee
None on record
PETER JOVCIC SAS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £14.66k £11.52k £10.48k £12.38k £16.10k
Total expenditure £19.45k £18.36k £13.69k £15.15k £22.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOODVIEW
THE DOWN
CLANDOWN
RADSTOCK
BA3 3DD
Phone:
01761436585
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available