Accounts and annual returns MULLER HOMES FOR THE ELDERLY LIMITED

Charity number: 1066831
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 13 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 13 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2007 11 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 11 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2006 07 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 07 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2004 19 January 2005 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 19 January 2005 21 days late