THE GEORGE MULLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision for children, families and young people through resourcing churches and other organizations, and by supporting Christian workers worldwide especially those involved therein as well as the care of orphans, education and literature distribution. Maintaining our unique heritage of supporting children. Grants may be made only where partnership exists and not for unsolicited requests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income:
£1,706,689
Donations and legacies | £1.15m | |
Charitable activities | £148.09k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £410.46k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,865,679
Raising funds | £30.75k | |
Charitable activities | £1.83m | |
Other | £0 |
£204,527 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £30.75k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.83m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £30.75k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.83m | |
Retained for future use | £45.54k |
People

9 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Albania
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- India
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Niger
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Réunion
- Romania
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Togo
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 December 1997: Standard registration
- 10 July 2024: Funds received from 1172410 EBENEZER CHURCH
- MULLERS (Working name)
- THE GEORGE MULLER FOUNDATION (Working name)
- MULLER TRUST FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES (Previous name)
- THE MULLER HOMES FOR CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK JAMES POWELL | Chair | 11 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Evan Vavasor Botwood | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eveline Saris | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Francis Farr Squire | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Giles | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sonia Margaret Home | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josh Kingston | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tigist Desta Grieve | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Liz Small | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Davies | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74m | £1.78m | £1.63m | £1.56m | £1.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69m | £1.68m | £1.68m | £1.67m | £1.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.22m | £1.29m | £1.16m | £1.05m | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £120.18k | £116.35k | £119.83k | £125.72k | £148.09k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £401.67k | £373.27k | £357.14k | £387.43k | £410.46k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £54.38k | £29.21k | £56.76k | £11.00k | £3.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.66m | £1.65m | £1.64m | £1.64m | £1.83m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £36.03k | £28.22k | £31.94k | £34.20k | £30.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.30k | £38.55k | £12.00k | £10.71k | £10.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £612.92k | £608.68k | £584.97k | £544.32k | £613.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £36.03k | £28.22k | £31.94k | £34.20k | £30.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.28m | £2.26m | £2.14m | £1.78m | £1.84m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.36m | £11.79m | £12.64m | £12.01m | £12.13m | |
|
Other assets | £357.69k | £638.07k | £522.16k | £824.90k | £770.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £156.66k | £122.22k | £158.19k | £131.83k | £205.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASS'N INCORP 26TH NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPEC RESOLUTIONS DATED 1ST NOV 2005, 29 JUL 2008 AND 4 NOV 2008 CERT OF INCORP ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 JAN 2009. ARTS OF ASSOC ADOPTED 6 JUL 2010 OBJECTS REG WITH CH 21 JUL 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (2) TO ADVANCE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH HOLY SCRIPTURE, INCLUDING, INSOFAR AS THE MEANS ARE AVAILABLE AT ANY TIME, THOUGH THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN WORKERS AND ORGANISATIONS (3) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, PARTICULARLY AMONG CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE ELDERLY (4) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR HUMAN SUFFERING, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE DEPRIVED OF NORMAL PARENTAL CARE.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDON OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 45-47
Loft House
College Road
Bishopston
BRISTOL
BS7 9FG
- Phone:
- 0117 9245001
- Email:
- admin@mullers.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window