STONEHOUSE CREEK COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community development in the area of Stonehouse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 11 September 1997: Standard registration
- 07 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCCDT (Working name)
- STONEHOUSE CREEK TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.08k | £246.22k | £96.56k | £117.06k | £133.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £341.29k | £273.37k | £89.35k | £111.06k | £118.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STONEHOUSE (ST PETER WARD) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH PLAYGROUPS. (D) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR SECTIONS OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING INDIVIDUAL COMMUNITIES DEFINED BY THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS IN WHICH THEY LIVE OR WORK OR THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINS) AS THE COMPANY SHALL THINK FIT. [PROVIDED THAT IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST ACTIVITIES OUTSIDE THE AREA REFERRED TO ABOVE WHERE IT IS OF THE OPINION THAT TO DO SO WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA]
Area of benefit
STONEHOUSE (ST PETER WARD) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window