THE HIBERNIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Lunch Club for the Elderly on Mondays, Wednesdays and Fridays held at The Reading Irish Centre which continues to grow We also provide Chiropody, Hairdressing, Reflexology on request, Zumba Gold and Bingo at each Lunch Club meeting and continues to be very popular
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 21 March 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAMUS MCADDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW MCADDEN MA CAUTAB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER MARY JOSEPH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.71k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2023 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2023 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE ELDERLY IRISH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY. 2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ELDERLY IRISH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit J, Brookside Nursery
Church Road
Reading
Reading
Berkshire
RG7 1TH
- Phone:
- 07967221668
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window