THE BICESTER SCHOOL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activities at present
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 July 1997: Standard registration
- BICESTER COMMUNITY COLLEGE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- BICESTER COMMUNITY COLLEGE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- THE BICESTER SCHOOL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ms Jo Waddams | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CYNTHIA DOROTHY BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73 | £35 | £15 | £118 | £413 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 APR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY TAKE ADVANTAGE OF EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES WHEN THEY PRESENT THEMSELVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bicester School
Queens Avenue
BICESTER
OX26 2NS
- Phone:
- 01869 243331
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window