THE BAREFOOT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barefoot works with young people and their communities to break down barriers through the involvement of young, vulnerable and disadvantaged people in activities, projects and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £7,525 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 17 June 1997: Standard registration
- 24 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1087523 MUTLEY GREENBANK TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.80k | £100.34k | £93.95k | £173.32k | £152.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.71k | £99.40k | £98.66k | £110.89k | £147.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.94k | £2.40k | £9.00k | £30.50k | £7.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1996 as amended on 15 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
For the benefit of the public, to act as a resource for young people aged between 10 and 19 years old, or up to 24 years old if disabled, (an age group selected as appropriate for being the beneficiaries of youth work) living in Devon and Cornwall by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of recreational, educational and other activities as a means of: (i) improving their lives and helping young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals; (ii) advancing education; (iii) advancing health; (iv) relieving unemployment; (v) providing recreational and leisure time activity in the interests of social welfare for people living in the area of benefit who have need by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances with a view to improving the conditions of life of such persons. (vi) supporting activities for the wider community that enhance the above.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window