KING'S SCHOOL, BRUTON

Charity number: 1071997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The school's objects are as follows:- * The advancement of education through the provision of an independent and boarding school; * To maintain its tradition of a Christian education. The school's main activity is to operate a senior school, King's School, at Bruton and a preparatory and pre-prep school, Hazlegrove, at Sparkford.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Sage Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Honor Stanley Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Philip Cole Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Sarah Matthews Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Gareth Evans Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Lorne Fiona Hodges Mrs Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Adam Clutterbuck Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Julian Mant Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Giles Pretor-Pinney Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Christopher Ros Stewart Birrell Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
ROBIN FRANCIS BADHAM-THORNHILL Trustee 04 July 2018
PINEWOOD SCHOOL LTD
Received: On time
EDWARD GEORGE HOBHOUSE Trustee 04 July 2018
WELLS CATHEDRAL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
BRUTON SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Received: On time
MARK FISHER Trustee 04 July 2018
THE VENTURE PARTNERSHIP FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Justin Broderick Hopkins Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Jean Walker Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.95m £13.98m £24.13m £16.73m £18.40m
Total expenditure £14.01m £13.09m £17.48m £17.60m £17.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £186.61k £233.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £484.39k £675.28k £448.08k £47.06k £308.95k
Income - Other trading activities £276.86k £10.02k £94.17k £192.88k £197.79k
Income - Charitable activities £13.17m £13.28m £16.32m £16.27m £17.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.43k £8.68k £12.08k £33.89k £149.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £7.27m £186.61k £522.55k
Income - Legacies £1.58k £86.36k £348.81k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.90m £13.05m £17.33m £17.40m £17.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.63k £31.26k £148.77k £132.59k £332.86k
Expenditure - Governance £25.48k £2.77k £1.78k £277.70k £11.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £233.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.70k £0 £64.28k £104.97k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £20.59m £20.72m £26.82m £27.62m £27.86m
Long-term investments £183.13k £226.07k £2.07m £3.25m £3.22m
Other assets £3.53m £4.17m £5.99m £2.73m £5.04m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£344.00k -£275.00k -£83.47k -£53.94k -£19.38k
Total liabilities £5.36m £5.32m £8.70m £7.73m £9.17m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 22 APRIL 2003 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 18 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF BRUTON
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Registration history
  • 03 September 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
KINGS SCHOOL
PLOX
BRUTON
BA10 0ED
Phone:
01749 814200